THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:30:20 PM
Selvarajah, Vijeyakumar
CPSO#:
88280
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 333 6203 28th avenue
edmonton AB T6L 6K3
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:18 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIJEYAKUMAR SELVARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVARAJAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 06 May 2008 to 02 Jun 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2008 to 24 Aug 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2020 |