skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 1:51:35 AM

Ross, James William Mackenzie

CPSO#: 88247

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FEMAP
860 Richmond St
London, ON
London ON  N6A 3H8
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 65178
Fax: (519) 646-6211 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
Floor A2
800 Commissioners Rd. East
London, ON
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 74894
Fax: 519-667-6836
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Parkwood Mental Health Institute
550 Wellington Rd
London, ON
London ON  N6C 5J1
Canada
Phone: 555-555-5555
Fax: 555-555-5555
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM MACKENZIE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
EL - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011