THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:29:37 AM
Cheema, Kiran Julia
CPSO#:
88243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
1300 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON L5C 4G8
Phone: (905) 232-6333
Fax: (905) 232-6341
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRAN JULIA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)