THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:21:11 AM
Al-Asiri, Jamal Ali Naser
CPSO#:
88239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
5N 533 - 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44549
Fax: 905-296-5199
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMAL ALI NASER AL-ASIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ASIRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 24 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 25 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Apr 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2019 |