THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:35:27 PM
Adie, Mohammad Amin
CPSO#:
88237
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aleppo, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. A. Adie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can email [email protected]
Date Received: 25 Feb 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Michigan
USA - North Dakota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AMIN ADIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2010 |