skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/12/21 20:53:07 PM

Shah, Himanshu Hasmukh

CPSO#: 88216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indore University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cover Health
75 Montpelier Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H4
Phone: 289-401-4678 Ext. 2
Fax: 855-943-3255 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Park Walk-In Clinic
Bradford ON  L3Z 0G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 551-5500
Fax: (905) 551-5400
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Teladoc Health, Inc.
2 Manhattanville Rd.
Purchase NY  10577
USA
USA
Phone: 1-844-798-3810
County: 
Electoral District: 

Tia Health
301-358 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6K 2B8
Canada
Phone: 437-266-9242
Fax: 437-317-9611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Himanshu H. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shah ( CPSO# 88216 )
Dr. C. Shah ( CPSO# 110343)

Business Address:
Cover Health
75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H4
Phone Number: 289-401-4678

Medical Records Location

Instructions: patients and third parties may use to access patients' medical records: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:12 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HIMANSHU HASMUKH SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2008