THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/09/23 0:36:31 AM
Hutchings, Robyn Jenifer
CPSO#:
88206
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
26 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 25 Apr 2008
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 26 Jul 2011
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2011 |