THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:13:06 AM
Al-Thaqfi, Saif Abdulaziz A
CPSO#:
88201
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 Aug 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Aug 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2014 |