THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:02:28 AM
Kvinlaug, Kylie Eric
CPSO#:
88187
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
18 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:28 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
EL - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 15 May 2008 to 18 Jun 2008
EL - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2008 |