THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:07:10 AM
Erak, Drago
CPSO#:
88167
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGO ERAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2008 to 08 May 2008
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |