THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:59:16 AM
Wali, Zubair Abdulhamed M
CPSO#:
88137
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
22 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2008 to 21 May 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 22 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 May 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 May 2009 |