THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:02:00 AM
DiTullio, Sonia Maria
CPSO#:
88115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vaithilingam, Sonia Maria (used until: 09 Mar 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-0659
Fax: 705-412-4198
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Anson General Hospital |
Iroquois Falls |
Bingham Memorial Hospital |
Matheson |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA DITULLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DITULLIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |