THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:53:42 AM
Mamelak, Adam Joseph
CPSO#:
88097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
12319 North Mopac Expressway
Austin TX 78758
United States
Phone: (512) 837-3376
Fax: (512) 837-3377
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Adam Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-(800) 775-0093.
Date Received: 29 Nov 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM JOSEPH MAMELAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMELAK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2008 |