THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:42:37 AM
Smith, Christopher Andrew
CPSO#:
88091
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Gen. Internal Medicine
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 78832
Fax: (613) 533-6654
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Petrof & Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Feb 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
|
Active |