skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 11/07/20 8:19:51 AM

MacKay, Rebecca Ellyn

CPSO#: 88083

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 19 Feb 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012