THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:44:50 PM
Sukerman, Darren Jay
CPSO#:
88072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
776 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Z 1N3
Phone: 416-354-2000
Fax: 416-354-2434
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Mar 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARREN JAY SUKERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKERMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |