THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
06/12/23 8:27:21 AM
Doyle, Jeffrey D
CPSO#:
88049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Intensive Care Unit
St. Catharines Hospital
Level 2B
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45501
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System - Niagara Site |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY D DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2009 |