THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:08:50 AM
Jansen, Jan Willem
CPSO#:
88037
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, French, German
Education: Free University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pathology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2015 |