THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:10:19 AM
Illamperuma, Chamani
CPSO#:
88034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: University of Colombo, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
204-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Phone: 9053032220
Fax: 9053032221
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:26 May 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHAMANI ILLAMPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILLAMPERUMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
EL - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2008 |