THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:38:34 PM
Frey, Benicio Noronha
CPSO#:
88029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Womens Health Concerns Clinic,
Department of Psychiatry and
Behavioural Neurosciences
100 West 5th Street, Room C124
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33605
Fax: 905-381-5629
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Jan 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 16 Jan 2008 to 03 Apr 2008
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 04 Apr 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2018 |
|
Active |