THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:34:42 PM
Kaur, Navpreet
CPSO#:
88017
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Castle Oaks Medical Centre
Unit 70
225 Castle Oaks Crossing
Brampton ON L6P 3X3
Phone: (905) 794-4994
Fax: (905) 794-7994
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVPREET KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |