THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:18:23 AM
Shoughary, Ali Toufic
CPSO#:
87997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: American University of Beirut, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1380 Upper Canada St
Kanata ON K2T 0N7
Phone: 6138362660
Fax: 6137358311
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:27 Aug 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI TOUFIC SHOUGHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUGHARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 12 Jul 2008
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |