THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:12:16 AM
Davila Acosta, Jorge Humberto
CPSO#:
87967
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3582
Fax: (613) 738-4811
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric Radiology |
Effective:02 Mar 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neuroradiology |
Effective:02 Mar 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Mar 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Mar 2016 |
|
Active |