THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/03/23 14:57:51 PM
Vaishnav, Vandana
CPSO#:
87965
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S0A9
Phone: (647) 973-2025
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VANDANA VAISHNAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAISHNAV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |