skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 5:47:58 AM

Agarwal, Parul

CPSO#: 87960

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2041
Fax: (416) 368-3192 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Jarvis St 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5B 2B7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

20 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M5B 2P3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bhatia Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhatia ( CPSO# 87551 )
Dr. P. Agarwal ( CPSO# 87960 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
MCL 2- 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARUL AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 25 Feb 2008
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 26 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010