THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:43:16 AM
Liquornik, Karen Nadine
CPSO#:
87946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16700 bayview avenue
#215
newmarket
ontario L3X 1W1
Newmarket ON L3X 1W1
Phone: (905)-953-7801
Fax: (905)-953-7803
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN NADINE LIQUORNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIQUORNIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |