THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:15:51 PM
Sarfraz, Saad
CPSO#:
87940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Quaid-i-Azam University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
Emergency Department
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-3033
Fax: (519) 322-0702
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAAD SARFRAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFRAZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)