THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:24:32 AM
Johnston, James Douglas
CPSO#:
87936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
KMH Cardiology and
Diagnostic Centres
Suite 108
751 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 569-7363
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:19 Dec 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
|
Active |