THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:09:40 AM
Samuel, Justin Varghese
CPSO#:
87931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6-737 Golf Links Rd
Ancaster ON L9K 1L5
Phone: (289) 239-8216
Fax: (289) 239-7746
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Feb 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |