THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:29:32 PM
Sahsi, Navpreet Singh
CPSO#:
87916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE 126
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:18 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVPREET SINGH SAHSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHSI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2014 |