THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:51:21 PM
Trabelsi, Asma
CPSO#:
87909
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: FACULTE DE MEDECINE DE SFAX, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 10 Mar 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 28 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |