THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:08:43 AM
Talballa, Hala Abdalla Hussein
CPSO#:
87889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ahfad University for Women, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa ON K1N 7Z5
Phone: (613) 7316620
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HALA ABDALLA HUSSEIN TALBALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBALLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 20 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2014 |