THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:44:42 PM
Bell, Dayna Lindsay
CPSO#:
87873
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 6136686442
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAYNA LINDSAY BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2013 to 10 Feb 2013
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2012 |