THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:06:46 AM
Kanji, Zainul Abdulmalik Alibhai
CPSO#:
87870
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Kachchi
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Zainul A.A. Kanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
2nd Floor, 595 Bradley Avenue
London, ON N6E 3Z8
Telephone: 519-668-0491
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 May 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2016 |