THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:27:28 PM
Al-Fawaz, Tariq Saleh Ali
CPSO#:
87857
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 21 Jan 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |