skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/07/20 22:33:29 PM

Fung, Michael G

CPSO#: 87854

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-9166
Fax: (905) 237-9266 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael G. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fung ( CPSO# 87854 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-9166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL G FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008