THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:34:05 AM
Elrefai, Thaer Hussein
CPSO#:
87827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Russian
Education: Rostovskij Medicinskij Institut, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3465 Platinum Dr
Door#80
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
Phone: 289-813-0786
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Elrefai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Qatar
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THAER HUSSEIN ELREFAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELREFAI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |