THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:32:08 PM
Shivakumar, Ranganayaky
CPSO#:
87806
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
344 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1H7
Phone: (705) 586-3101
Fax: (705) 586-3103
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANGANAYAKY SHIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2009 |