THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:36:31 AM
Shivakumar, Kuppuswami
CPSO#:
87805
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tver State Medical Academy, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KUPPUSWAMI SHIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2010 |