THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:47:35 AM
Makhdoom, Sohail
CPSO#:
87799
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Mar 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
|
Active |