THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:32:05 AM
Chemparathy, Joseph Varghese
CPSO#:
87794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Calcutta, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Medical Associates
Suite 34
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH VARGHESE CHEMPARATHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEMPARATHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2021 |