THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:44:21 AM
Tahir, Fadwah Hamzah Abd Alhamid
CPSO#:
87788
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
09 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Aug 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:09 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Oct 2009 |