skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/05/22 15:56:37 PM

Manokaran, Kamini

CPSO#: 87787

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education: University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (647) 347-2401
Fax: (647) 347-2801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamini Manokaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Manokaran ( CPSO# 87787 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (647) 347-2401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective:05 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 10 Oct 2007 to 07 Nov 2007
PEAP - R - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 17 Feb 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 25 Oct 2021 Active
 Dr.  Kamini Manokaran may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology in an office setting, only.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 29, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kamini Manokaran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 29, 2021:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Manokaran’s care of a patient in her rheumatology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Manokaran will engage in professional education in medical ethics and professionalism and medical record keeping.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)