THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:18:19 PM
Oglaza, Piotr Przemyslaw
CPSO#:
87777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
221 Portsmouth Ave
Kingston ON K7M 1V5
Phone: 613 549 1232
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Denmark
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Nov 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIOTR PRZEMYSLAW OGLAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGLAZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 22 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2009 to 22 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2009 |