THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:56:34 AM
Sarkaria, Gagandeep Singh
CPSO#:
87760
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Medical University of Debrecen, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Westmount Rd
Guelph ON N1H 5H8
Phone: 5198246000
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph |
Guelph |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH SARKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARKARIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |