THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:27:36 AM
Zorzi, Alexandra Patricia
CPSO#:
87741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm B1-112 Victoria Campus
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PATRICIA ZORZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |