skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/08/22 20:45:25 PM

Horri, Mehdi

CPSO#: 87715

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 - 1176 Nicholson Rd
Estevan SK  S4A 0H3
Phone: (306) 637-2770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2008 to 24 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 20 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Dec 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 Dec 2021 Active
 As from December 1, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mehdi Horri in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Horri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of
 
DR. MEHDI HORRI
("Dr. Horri")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
 	
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code; 

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 

(2)	I, Dr. Horri, certificate of registration number 87715, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that I committed an act of professional misconduct that would be considered an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Code to the Discipline Tribunal in a Notice of Hearing dated May 3, 2021.

(4)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that this Undertaking will be made available to the Discipline Tribunal when it considers the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing. 

B. 	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Horri, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	I, Dr. Horri, undertake that I will not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a)	I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 

(b)	I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of continuing professional development that meets the requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for continuing professional development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and

(c)	The College approves my return to the practice of medicine. 

(7)	II, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may, among other things:

(a)	request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration;

(b)	require that I engage in a remediation plan approved by the College; or

(c)	request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(8)	I, Dr. Horri, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)	I, Dr. Horri, also undertake to abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy. 

C.  	ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(10)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a), the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College referred allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Tribunal in a Notice of Hearing dated May 3, 2021. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Horri has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. Upon his return to practice in Ontario, Dr. Horri will comply with additional terms, conditions and limitations set out in his Undertaking with the College, if any.

D.  	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Horri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(17)	I, Dr. Horri, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.






Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 07 Dec 2021
Summary:

On May 3, 2021 allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Horri were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now referred to as the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.

The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Horri had committed an act of professional misconduct under clause 51(1)(b) of the Health Professions Procedural Code in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario, found the member had committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the Tribunal, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.

The Tribunal heard the matter on December 7, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Horri attended the hearing.

On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission and after hearing submissions of both counsel, the OPSDT found Dr. Horri committed an act of professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario, has found that the member committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.

Disposition

On December 7, 2021, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Horri attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• Dr. Horri pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 by January 7, 2022.

Release of reasons

The OPSDT released its reasons for its decision on January 14, 2022. The decision is viewable below.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2021-12-07

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2016
Summary:

On September 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Mehdi Horri committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, by having engaged in a sexual relationship with a patient too soon after the termination of the doctor-patient relationship.

Dr. Horri, a 51-year-old family physician who practises family medicine in Saskatchewan, graduated in 1998 from the University of Tehran in Iran. He obtained a certificate of Independent Practice in 2015.

Patient A was in her early 20’s when she became a patient of a family doctor, Dr. X, who diagnosed her with depression with suicidal ideation. Dr. X prescribed antidepressants to Patient A. During her third and final visit, Dr. X diagnosed Patient A with insomnia second to depression and found that Patient A did not presently have suicidal or homicidal thought process, prescribing her a different anti-depressant and sleep medicine. Following this appointment, Dr. X began a maternity leave.

Patient A agreed to continue to attend for appointments with Dr. Horri, who was acting as a substitute during Dr. X’s leave.

DOCTOR-PATIENT RELATIONSHIP

Dr. Horri saw Patient A between January and June 2010, continuing the care plan commenced by Dr. X and providing Patient A with on-going support and medication management.

Patient A describes that, because Dr. Horri was a medical professional whom she would not have to see again, she disclosed personal information to Dr. Horri that she had not previously disclosed to anyone. Dr. Horri provided Patient A with support for ongoing personal challenges, depression, anxiety, and sleep difficulties. Dr. Horri renewed prescriptions to Patient A for anti-depressants and sleep medicine.

During their appointments, Patient A recollects that when she would share with Dr. Horri details of her familial challenges, Dr. Horri would tell her that he could relate to what she was experiencing given his own experiences with his family of origin.

POST-TERMINATION SEXUAL RELATIONSHIP

Patient A’s final appointment with Dr. Horri was on a date in mid-June 2010, which was the date the doctor-patient relationship ended. Following that appointment, Patient A dropped off a thank you note for Dr. Horri at his office. Dr. Horri looked up Patient A’s phone number in her medical. He called her to thank her for the card, to offer his ongoing friendship, and to suggest that Patient A call him if she needed a friend.

Patient A described that at his point in her life, she was fairly isolated from her support network.

Dr. Horri and Patient A developed a friendship over the subsequent weeks. They met on a few occasions for coffee or walks together.

Approximately two weeks after Patient A’s last appointment with Dr. Horri, Dr. Horri visited Patient A’s apartment. After watching a movie together, they had sexual intercourse. Patient A described that she was scared and upset because they did not use a condom and she was worried about pregnancy. Dr. Horri left $200 on Patient A’s nightstand, which Patient A found highly insulting. Dr. Horri intended this as a supportive gesture.

On July 1, 2010, Dr. Horri left for Thunder Bay where he entered the Family Practice anaesthesia program at the Northern Ontario Medical School.

After his departure, Dr. Horri and Patient A continued an on-and-off long-distance intimate relationship for about three years. Patient A travelled to see Dr. Horri and Dr. Horri would sometimes travel to see Patient A. During and after the end of the sexual relationship, Dr. Horri provided Patient A with gifts, including two $2,000 e-transfers, a credit card in her name, and a laptop. Dr. Horri and Patient A remained in contact after the sexual relationship ended until the spring of 2014.

DISPOSITION

On October 13, 2016, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On March 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty.

APPEAL

On April 6, 2017, Dr. Horri appealed the penalty decision to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal operated to stay the penalty decision pending the outcome of the appeal. On May 30, 2018, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Horri’s appeal and returned the matter of penalty to the Discipline Committee for redetermination. On June 19, 2018, the College filed a motion for leave to appeal the decision of the Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal. On September 17, 2018, the Court of Appeal denied the motion for leave to appeal.

PENALTY RE-DETERMINATION

The penalty redetermination hearing took place on November 7, 2018. The Discipline Committee reserved its decision. On March 29, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
-The Registrar suspend Dr. Horri’s certificate of registration for a period of twelve months, effective immediately;
- The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Horri’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Horri shall complete an individualized course in medical ethics approved by the College to include professional responsibility, boundaries, and professional communication within 12 months of the date of this Order and will provide reports of successful completion to the College, at his own expense.
-Dr. Horri appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
-Dr. Horri pay to the College costs in the amount of $15,680.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

APPEAL

On April 26, 2019, Dr. Horri appealed the penalty decision to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal operates to stay the penalty decision pending the outcome of the appeal.

On June 18, 2019, the Court received Dr. Horri’s Notice of Abandonment of his appeal.
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: September 26, 2016 Penalty Hearing : October 13, 2016 New Penalty Hearing date: November 7, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mehdi Horri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 1, 2021:

The College referred allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Tribunal in a Notice of Hearing dated May 3, 2021. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Horri has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. Upon his return to practice in Ontario, Dr. Horri will comply with additional terms, conditions and limitations set out in his Undertaking with the College, if any.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: April 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On March 23, 2020, the Council of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan ordered that Dr. Horri’s medical licence be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 4, 2020 and that Dr. Horri be reprimanded. CPSO was notified of this action by CPSS on March 23, 2020.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: September 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On June 16, 2017, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan revoked Dr. Horri’s medical licence based on the finding of unprofessional conduct made by the CPSO against Dr. Horri in 2016 (See Previous Hearings for more information). We note that the Saskatchewan College reinstated Dr. Horri’s licence on June 22, 2018.

 

Source: College of Physicians & Surgeons of Saskatchewan
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: June 16, 2017
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: On June 16, 2017, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan revoked Dr. Horri’s medical licence based on the finding of unprofessional conduct made by the CPSO against Dr. Horri in 2016 (See Previous Hearings for more information). We note that the Saskatchewan College reinstated Dr. Horri’s licence on June 22, 2018.