THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:05:10 PM
Adel, Anoushirvan
CPSO#:
87702
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - West Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANOUSHIRVAN ADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2008 |