THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 2:49:25 AM
Roth, Johannes
CPSO#:
87679
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Spanish
Education: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Johannes Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 May 2023 |