THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 12:02:51 PM
Rafiqi, Wajahat Hussain
CPSO#:
87665
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hussain, Wajahat (used until: 25 May 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Persian, Urdu
Education: Kashmir University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
shams clinic
Unit 6
15- Ashby -FIELD ROAD
Brampton ON L6X 3B7
Phone: (905) 230-4811
Fax: (905) 230-4814
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAJAHAT HUSSAIN RAFIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2009 |